U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00169-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Mena-Panduro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.