U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gisseman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.