U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eva
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.