U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguirre
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.