U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00577
  • Case Name: Wireless Advanced Vehicle Electrification, LLC v. WiTricity Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 20, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Permanent Injunction]
  • January 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 07, 2024: [Memorandum Decision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.