U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00295-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Figueroa, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [U-ACT Referral Order]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Joinder]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 02, 2024: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.