U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weilacher et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • March 13, 2025: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.