U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hennessy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.