U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Gold Cross Services v. The Cigna Group
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.