U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00594
  • Case Name: Defour v. Mailroom Supervisor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Transport Inmate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • April 22, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 10, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 10, 2025: [Court Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.