open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00523
    Party Name:Clayborn v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers's Order and Notice]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer To Complaint]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?229892
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =