U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00353-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 03, 2024: [Order]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 27, 2023: [Order]
  • December 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2023
  • November 28, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.