U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 10, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2015: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2015: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2015: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.