open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00217
    Party Name:Hutter v. Ezelleron Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Case - Civil]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Teleconference]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Amended]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Discovery Request]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Subpoena]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Mediation Conferences]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - General]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:March 09, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?56765
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =