U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres Delgado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Oral Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 23, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 22, 2018: [Unseal Case]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 13, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.