U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tucker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • September 17, 2020: [Exit Record]
  • September 17, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 27, 2018: [Letter]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 13, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • March 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • March 23, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received - formerly Rule 40]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.