U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Declet
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order of Garnishment]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Letter]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.