U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soto-Cuevas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • April 04, 2019: [Return of Property - PostTrial]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 09, 2019: [Letter]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 18, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 14, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.