U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vazquez-Luna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • December 17, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • December 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 17, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • December 17, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 14, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 14, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2018: [Remark]
  • December 03, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 25, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.