U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maksymov
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • December 12, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 29, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.