U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Juarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • December 07, 2018: [Downward Departure]
  • December 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2018: [Plea and Sentence]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 04, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 09, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.