U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pimentel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • March 07, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 03, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.