U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Xitumul
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • April 05, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • April 05, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 01, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.