U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waterman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • April 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 15, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.