U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Vargas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 25, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.