U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vaughn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Remark]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 10, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 08, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.