U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Remark]
  • November 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 21, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 10, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 09, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.