U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosas-Vento
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • December 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 23, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 19, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 21, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 19, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.