open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01694
    Party Name:Rondevoo Technologies, LLC v. Arterys, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69980
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =