open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01150
    Party Name:Blackbird Tech LLC v. e.l.f. Cosmetics, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Oral Argument]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Reply]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Amended]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69192
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =