U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Guillen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • April 30, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • April 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 02, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 16, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 21, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 21, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.