U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mateo-Nina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 27, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 14, 2021: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • January 14, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 06, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 03, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 25, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.