U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anemone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • February 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 05, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • January 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2020: [Bail Hearing - not revocation]
  • December 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 11, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 05, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.