U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01246
  • Case Name: Delta Electronics, Inc. v. Vicor Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
  • May 08, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 06, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Discovery Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 02, 2025: [- Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 27, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 20, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 18, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Teleconference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.