U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-01341
  • Case Name: Averon US, Inc. v. AT&T Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 06, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.