U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00958
  • Case Name: Hangzhou Qianmai Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd. v. Bearaby Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 04, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [SO ORDERED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.