U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01323
  • Case Name: Multifold International Incorporated Pte. Ltd. v. Google LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 25, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 24, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 12, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.