U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01324
  • Case Name: Snowman v. FCA US LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 14, 2025: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief - Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 09, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.