U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01406
  • Case Name: Ogunlade v. St. Francis Hospital, Inc., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.