open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:19-cr-20071-1
    Party Name:USA v. Guillermo Reyes
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Court Verdict]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance & Arraignment (WITH OPTIONAL SDO)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?543457
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =