Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:0:19-cr-60041-1
    Party Name:USA v. Medrano-Boteo
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance & Arraignment (WITH OPTIONAL SDO)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?543447
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =