open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cv-00364
    Party Name:Pendarvis v. Fay Servicing, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case management and scheduling order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of appearance]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Report]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear telephonically]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons returned executed]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons issued]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Related case order and track 2 notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Interested persons order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?360131
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =