Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-11871-
    Party Name:Sanh Van Ly and Thu Thi Le
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Certification of Financial Management Course (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF]]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Amended Document]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form 122A-1 [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Osborne, Leslie S [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?744330
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =