Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-bk-02235-
    Party Name:Ronald Alexander Armstrong
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hyman, Larry S. [(NO PAPER) - Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hyman, Larry S. [Certificate Of Completion of Financial Management Course (or) Certificate of Debtor Education]
    Date Published:April 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hyman, Larry S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hyman, Larry S. [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hyman, Larry S. [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1278502
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =