Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-13378-
    Party Name:Claenett Espinosa
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Order Dismissing Case (Deficiencies)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Notice of Requirement to File a Certificate of Completion of a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Certification of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Scott N [Notice of Pro Bono Resources]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?745869
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =