open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:0:19-cv-61454
    Party Name:Leblang v. EXP Realty, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?551508
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =