open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00246-1
    Party Name:USA v. Monix
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in opposition]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proof of publication]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing (courtroom only)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of plea]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations concerning plea of guilty]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent regarding entry of plea]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to institute presentence investigation report]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for protection]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protection]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to continue trial]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial discovery order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?364943
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =