open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:19-cr-20344-1
    Party Name:USA v. Demoya
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Select as last hrg for OPT SDO txt)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Bond]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?551263
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =