open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00247-1
    Party Name:USA v. Sanchez-Lule
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of waiver of defendant's presence at arraignment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice canceling hearing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to continue trial]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial discovery order]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for detention]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to appoint counsel]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Interpreter]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery ]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Interpreter]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?364962
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =