open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:18-19121-
    Party Name:1 Global Capital LLC and Steven M. Bramlett
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Compromise Controversy]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing (BK)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Claims Register (Claims Agent ONLY)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Compromise Controversy Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?735175
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =